WI AB507 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.01 (2); and to create 346.275 and 346.30 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: vehicle owner's liability for failure to yield the right-of-way to persons in a work zone and providing a penalty.
Title
Vehicle owner's liability for failure to yield the right-of-way to persons in a work zone and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-04 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-10-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-10-19 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2021-09-08 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-08-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-08-31 | House | Introduced |