WI AB500 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 348.26 (4); to amend 348.26 (2) and 348.26 (4) (title); and to create 348.26 (4) (a) and 348.26 (4) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: single trip permits for the movement of oversize factory-built homes. (FE)
Title
Single trip permits for the movement of oversize factory-built homes. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] |
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-11-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-11-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab500 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB500.pdf |