WI AB496 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 28.; and to create 224.55 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring the Department of Financial Institutions to implement a section 529A ABLE savings account program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Requiring the Department of Financial Institutions to implement a section 529A ABLE savings account program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-04 | House | LRB correction |
2021-08-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-08-04 | House | Introduced |