WI AB495 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 948.605 (2) (a) and 948.605 (2) (b) 1r.; to amend 175.60 (2g) (a) and 175.60 (5) (a) 6.; and to create 948.605 (1) (ai) and (ap) of the statutes; Relating to: possession of a firearm in a vehicle on school grounds by a person with a license to carry a concealed weapon.
Title
Possession of a firearm in a vehicle on school grounds by a person with a license to carry a concealed weapon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-08 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 36 |
2022-01-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Neubauer, Stubbs and Andraca |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2022-01-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-05 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2022-01-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-08-04 | House | Introduced |