WI AB492 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: loan related to the Verso Paper Mill in the city of Wisconsin Rapids; loan related to the Park Falls Pulp and Paper Mill in the city of Park Falls; funding for the University of Wisconsin System; special education funding and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Loan related to the Verso Paper Mill in the city of Wisconsin Rapids; loan related to the Park Falls Pulp and Paper Mill in the city of Park Falls; funding for the University of Wisconsin System; special education funding and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-01 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-09-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2021-08-04 | House | Introduced |