WI AB483 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0413 (1) (b) 1. and 66.0413 (1) (c); and to create 66.0413 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: municipal raze orders for certain insured dwellings. (FE)
Title
Municipal raze orders for certain insured dwellings. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Dora Drake [D] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] |
Rep. Beth Meyers [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] |
Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Don Vruwink [D] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Sen. Rob Stafsholt [R] |
Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. John Jagler [R] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-25 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-10-21 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-09-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-02 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2021-09-01 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2021-08-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2021-08-04 | House | Introduced |