WI AB480 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 813.125 (1) (am) 1. and 813.125 (1) (am) 2.; to amend 48.57 (3p) (g) 2., 48.685 (1) (c) 2., 50.065 (1) (e) 1., 103.34 (1) (b) 2., 165.84 (7) (ab) 1., 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 302.11 (1g) (a) 2., 303.07 (2), 813.123 (1) (eg), 813.125 (1) (am) (intro.), 895.45 (1) (a), 938.208 (1) (a), 938.34 (4m) (b) 1., 938.355 (2d) (b) 3., 939.62 (2m) (a) 2m. b., 939.632 (1) (e) 1., 941.29 (1g) (a), 941.291 (1) (b), 949.03 (1) (b), 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a., 969.035 (1), 969.08 (10) (b), 973.01 (2) (c) 2. a., 973.0135 (1) (b) 2., 973.06 (1) (av) 2. a., 973.06 (1) (av) 2. b., 973.123 (1) and 980.01 (6) (b); and to create 343.12 (7) (c) 9j., 813.12 (1) (ar), 813.12 (5b), 813.123 (6g), 813.125 (1) (am) 3., 813.125 (1) (am) 4. (intro.), 813.125 (5b), 939.623, 940.198, 940.225 (1) (d) and 971.109 of the statutes; Relating to: increased penalties for crimes against elder persons; restraining orders for elder persons; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an elder person; sexual assault of an elder person; physical abuse of an elder person; and providing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increased penalties for crimes against elder persons; restraining orders for elder persons; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an elder person; sexual assault of an elder person; physical abuse of an elder person; and providing a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-12SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-11HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-11HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-02-11HouseRules suspended
2020-02-11HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-11HouseRead a second time
2020-02-06HousePlaced on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-06HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 1
2020-02-06HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 1
2020-02-06HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2020-01-09HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-09HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative McGuire
2020-01-09HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative McGuire
2020-01-09HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative McGuire
2019-11-14HousePublic hearing held
2019-09-26HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2019-09-26HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback