WI AB476 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 24.61 (3) (a) 2., 24.61 (3) (a) 3., 121.91 (3) (a) 1. and 281.61 (1) (am); and to create 24.61 (3) (a) 1. dm., 24.61 (3) (a) 3m., 118.07 (6), 121.91 (3) (a) 3. and 281.61 (8) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: lead testing of potable water sources in certain schools; providing loans for lead remediation in certain schools; and providing an exception to referendum restrictions for lead remediation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lead testing of potable water sources in certain schools; providing loans for lead remediation in certain schools; and providing an exception to referendum restrictions for lead remediation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-11HouseSenator Jacque added as a cosponsor
2020-02-04HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-30HouseRepresentative Crowley added as a coauthor
2020-01-23HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt
2019-10-16HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-10-02HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-09-26HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities
2019-09-26HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback