WI AB473 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: therapeutic diets in certain long-term care facilities.
Title
Therapeutic diets in certain long-term care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-24 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-10-24 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-10-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-09-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2017-09-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-08-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care |
2017-08-17 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab473 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB473.pdf |