WI AB47 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.996 (2) (d); to amend 145.02 (title) and 440.03 (7); and to create 101.02 (25), 145.02 (5), 946.77 and 971.19 (13) of the statutes; Relating to: material misstatements on applications for certain credentials and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Material misstatements on applications for certain credentials and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab47 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB47.pdf |