WI AB469 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.6195 (1) (a) 1. and 941.291 (1) (b); and to create 941.293 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibition against undetectable firearms, possessing a frame or receiver of a firearm without a serial number, and providing a penalty.
Title
Prohibition against undetectable firearms, possessing a frame or receiver of a firearm without a serial number, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-01 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-08-04 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2021-07-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-07-26 | House | Introduced |