WI AB455 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-13 - Published 11-12-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-13 - Published 11-12-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 29.592 (3); to amend 29.324 (2) (intro.) and 29.592 (1) (intro.); and to create 29.324 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: age and hunting restrictions applicable to the hunting mentorship program.
Title
Age and hunting restrictions applicable to the hunting mentorship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-13 | House | Published 11-12-2017 |
2017-11-13 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 62 |
2017-11-09 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-9-2017 |
2017-11-09 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-9-2017 |
2017-11-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 57, Noes 32, Paired 4 |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kleefisch and Stafsholt |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 35 |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Sargent, Barca, Billings, Hebl, Shankland and Hesselbein |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-09-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-09-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2017-08-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-08-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Milroy, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Stuck and Brostoff |
2017-08-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-07-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-07-26 | House | Introduced |