WI AB454 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 20.285 (1) (sp) (title); and to create 20.285 (1) (at) and 36.25 (58) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for the Wisconsin Institute for Sustainable Technology at the University of Wisconsin-Stevens Point and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding for the Wisconsin Institute for Sustainable Technology at the University of Wisconsin-Stevens Point and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2023-11-07HouseRepresentative Jacobson added as a coauthor
2023-10-02HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-09-28HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation
2023-09-28HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback