WI AB45 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.04045 of the statutes; Relating to: restricting local regulation of utility service based on the type or source of energy. (FE)
Title
Restricting local regulation of utility service based on the type or source of energy. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-06-21 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-06-15 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-06-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-06-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 11, Noes 5 |
2023-06-14 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 11, Noes 5 |
2023-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2023-03-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl |
2023-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced |