WI AB45 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 16.754 (1) (a) and 16.754 (2); to amend 16.72 (2) (c), 16.754 (title), 16.754 (2) (title) and 16.754 (3) (intro.); and to create 16.754 (1) (am), 16.754 (2) (a), 16.754 (2m) and 66.0145 of the statutes; Relating to: state procurement of products and services from businesses located in this state and setting a goal for local government to purchase a certain percentage of products and services from businesses located in this state. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State procurement of products and services from businesses located in this state and setting a goal for local government to purchase a certain percentage of products and services from businesses located in this state. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2017-04-18HouseSenator Shilling added as a cosponsor
2017-03-07HouseRefused to withdraw from the committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 34, Noes 64
2017-02-27HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-01-31HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
2017-01-31HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback