WI AB45 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 59.66 (1) (c), 59.66 (2) (a) 1. and 59.66 (2) (a) 2. of the statutes; relating to: authorizing county treasurers to provide notice of unclaimed funds by using the Internet. (FE)
Title
Authorizing county treasurers to provide notice of unclaimed funds by using the Internet. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-03-30 | House | Representative Wynn added as a coauthor |
2011-03-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2011-03-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab45 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB45.pdf |