WI AB436 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.370 (2) (gi), 23.321 (2g), 29.604 (7m), 30.025 (1e) (c), 31.23 (3) (e), 77.105, 77.81 (1m), 77.81 (5m), 77.83 (2m), 77.84 (2) (bp), 77.88 (9) (d) 2., 77.883, 87.30 (2) (b), 196.491 (3) (a) 3. c., 227.483 (3) (c), 293.01 (12m), subchapter III of chapter 295 [precedes 295.40] and 323.60 (1) (gm); to renumber and amend 77.88 (9) (d) 1. and 87.30 (2) (a); to amend 20.370 (2) (gh), 20.455 (1) (gh), 20.566 (7) (e), 20.566 (7) (v), 29.604 (4) (intro.), 29.604 (4) (c) (intro.), 30.025 (1e) (a), 30.133 (2), 32.02 (12), 70.375 (1) (as), 70.375 (1) (bm), 70.375 (4) (h), 70.38 (2), 70.395 (1e), 70.395 (2) (dc) 1., 70.395 (2) (dc) 4., 70.395 (2) (fm), 70.395 (2) (g) (intro.), 70.395 (2) (g) 3., 70.395 (2) (h) 1., 70.395 (2) (hg), 70.395 (2) (hr), 70.395 (2) (hw), 74.25 (1) (a) 6., 74.30 (1) (f), 77.83 (2) (a), 77.84 (2) (b), 77.84 (2) (bm), 77.88 (3), 77.88 (5) (a) 1., 77.88 (5) (a) 2., 77.88 (5) (ar) 1., 77.88 (5) (ar) 2., 77.88 (5) (b) 1., 77.88 (5) (b) 2., 77.89 (2) (a), 107.001 (1), 107.01 (intro.), 107.01 (2), 107.02, 107.03, 107.04, 107.11, 107.12, 107.20 (1), 107.20 (2), 107.30 (8), 107.30 (15), 107.30 (16), 160.19 (12), 196.491 (3) (a) 3. b., 196.491 (4) (b) 2., 281.36 (3g) (h) 2., 281.65 (2) (a), 281.75 (17) (b), 283.84 (3m), 287.13 (5) (e), 289.62 (2) (g) 2., 289.62 (2) (g) 6., 292.01 (1m), chapter 293 (title), 293.01 (5), 293.01 (7), 293.01 (9), 293.01 (12), 293.01 (18), 293.01 (25), 293.21 (1) (a), 293.25 (2) (a), 293.25 (4), 293.37 (4) (b), 293.47 (1) (b), 293.50 (1) (b), 293.50 (2) (a), 293.50 (2) (b), 293.51 (1), 293.65 (3) (a), 293.65 (3) (b), 293.86, chapter 295 (title), 295.16 (4) (f), 299.85 (7) (a) 2. and 4., 299.95, 323.60 (5) (d) 3., 706.01 (9) and 710.02 (2) (d); to create 107.001 (2) and 293.01 (8) of the statutes; and to affect 2013 Wisconsin Act 1, section 103; Relating to: the regulation of ferrous metallic mining and related activities. (FE)
Title
The regulation of ferrous metallic mining and related activities. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mining and Rural Development |
2015-10-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab436 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB436.pdf |