WI AB432 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 341.135; to amend 341.12 (4) (a) and 341.16 (1) (a); and to create 341.12 (4) (am), 341.135 (2), 341.135 (3) and 341.16 (2s) of the statutes; Relating to: construction and issuance of motor vehicle registration plates. (FE)
Title
Construction and issuance of motor vehicle registration plates. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:13 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-27 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2022-01-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2022-01-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 10, Noes 3 |
2022-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2021-12-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-11-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2021-11-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman |
2021-10-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-07 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-07-01 | House | Introduced |