WI AB432 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 146.40 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: hours of instructional program for nurse aids.
Title
Hours of instructional program for nurse aids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 32 |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Subeck, Anderson, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Fields, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Kolste, Mason, Meyers, Milroy, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stuck, C. Taylor, Vruwink, Wachs, Young, Zamarripa and Zepnick |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Subeck, Anderson, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Fields, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Kolste, Mason, Meyers, Milroy, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stuck, C. Taylor, Vruwink, Wachs, Young, Zamarripa and Zepnick |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Subeck, Anderson, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Fields, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Kolste, Mason, Meyers, Milroy, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stuck, C. Taylor, Vruwink, Wachs, Young, Zamarripa and Zepnick |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-27 | House | Senator L. Taylor withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2017-10-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-10-17 | House | Representative Billings withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-09-13 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2017-09-06 | House | Representatives Macco and Kremer added as coauthors |
2017-09-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-08-03 | House | Representative Pronschinske added as a coauthor |
2017-08-02 | House | Representative Billings added as a coauthor |
2017-06-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care |
2017-06-30 | House | Introduced |