WI AB426 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 980.08 (4) (dm) 1. (intro.), 980.08 (4) (dm) 2. and 980.08 (6m) of the statutes; Relating to: notification to tribal chairs and tribal law enforcement agencies for a sexually violent person being placed on supervised release in a county in which the tribe is located.
Title
Notification to tribal chairs and tribal law enforcement agencies for a sexually violent person being placed on supervised release in a county in which the tribe is located.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-08-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-08-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced |