WI AB422 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.380 (3) (dm) and 41.567 of the statutes; Relating to: rural creative economy grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Rural creative economy grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rozar |
2021-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-08 | House | Representative Shelton added as a coauthor |
2021-11-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced |