WI AB422 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 134.66 (title), 134.66 (1) (g), 134.66 (2) (a), (am), (b) and (cm) 1m., 134.66 (2m) (a), 134.66 (3), 139.345 (3) (a) (intro.), 139.345 (3) (b) 2., 139.345 (7) (a), subchapter IX (title) of chapter 254 [precedes 254.911], 254.916 (2) (intro.), 254.916 (3) (a), (b), (c) and (d), 254.916 (3) (f) 2., 254.92 (title), 254.92 (1), 254.92 (2), 254.92 (2m) (intro.) and 254.92 (3); and to create 134.66 (1) (jm), 254.911 (11) and 254.916 (2) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: raising the legal age for sale, purchase, and possession of cigarettes and nicotine and tobacco products, providing a legal age for sale, purchase, and possession of vapor products, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Raising the legal age for sale, purchase, and possession of cigarettes and nicotine and tobacco products, providing a legal age for sale, purchase, and possession of vapor products, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Hesselbein added as a coauthor |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Billings, Kolste, Sargent, Vining, Anderson, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, L. Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kolste, Billings, Sargent and Vining |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2020-02-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kolste, Billings, Sargent and Vining |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:08 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Billings, Kolste and Sargent |
2020-02-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2019-11-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-22 | House | Representative Emerson withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-10-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced |