WI AB408 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 200.35 (14) (title), 200.35 (14) (a) 2. and 200.35 (14) (b); and to create 200.35 (14) (a) 2. b., 200.35 (14) (d) 3m. and 200.35 (14) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: authorization for metropolitan sewerage districts containing a first class city to finance and construct a dredged material management facility located in the city of Milwaukee. (FE)
Title
Authorization for metropolitan sewerage districts containing a first class city to finance and construct a dredged material management facility located in the city of Milwaukee. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-30-2021 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-30-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-29 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Rodriguez |
2021-06-29 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to calendar of 6-29-2021 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2021-06-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-06-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2021-06-23 | House | Introduced |