WI AB401 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 563.908; to amend 563.907 (1); and to create 563.908 (2) and (3) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting 50/50 raffles from license requirements. (FE)
Title
Exempting 50/50 raffles from license requirements. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 2 |
2021-10-06 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-04 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-06-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-06-14 | House | Introduced |