WI AB400 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 347.48 (4) (as) 1. and 347.48 (4) (as) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: use of child safety restraint systems in motor vehicles. (FE)
Title
Use of child safety restraint systems in motor vehicles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-07 | House | Representative Johnson added as a coauthor |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-12-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 2 |
2015-12-10 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2015-12-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-12-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Loudenbeck and C. Taylor |
2015-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-28 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2015-10-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-10-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab400 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB400.pdf |