WI AB398 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.05 (2m) (a) and 6.56 (4); and to create 5.05 (2m) (fg), 5.05 (2m) (fh) and 5.05 (2m) (fi) of the statutes; Relating to: investigations by the Elections Commission based on information provided by the Electronic Registration Information Center and municipalities indicating that Wisconsin registered voters may have voted more than once in the same election or that individuals voted in an election despite being disqualified from voting for certain reasons. (FE)
Title
Investigations by the Elections Commission based on information provided by the Electronic Registration Information Center and municipalities indicating that Wisconsin registered voters may have voted more than once in the same election or that individuals voted in an election despite being disqualified from voting for certain reasons. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Representative Brooks added as a coauthor |
2021-09-13 | House | Representative Armstrong added as a coauthor |
2021-08-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2021-06-14 | House | Introduced |