WI AB386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-22)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-22)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.32 (1b) of the statutes; Relating to: property tax assessments based on comparable sales and market segments. (FE)
Title
Property tax assessments based on comparable sales and market segments. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up (Y: 34 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-21 | House | Representative Kerkman added as a coauthor |
2018-02-20 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2018-02-14 | House | Senator Johnson added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-13 | House | Representative Goyke added as a coauthor |
2018-02-13 | House | Representatives Hesselbein, Crowley, Brostoff, Riemer, Neubauer, Zamarripa, Pope, Sinicki and Kitchens added as coauthors |
2018-02-13 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up, Ayes 34, Noes 59 |
2018-02-13 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-14 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2017-11-30 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative R. Brooks |
2017-11-17 | House | Representative Anderson added as a coauthor |
2017-10-13 | House | Representative Wachs added as a coauthor |
2017-09-26 | House | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2017-08-29 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-08-28 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2017-08-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative R. Brooks |
2017-08-09 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2017-07-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative R. Brooks |
2017-06-30 | House | Representative C. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2017-06-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-06-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-06-14 | House | Introduced |