WI AB378 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.28 (13m) of the statutes; Relating to: making school district and school financial information available to the public. (FE)
Title
Making school district and school financial information available to the public. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2021-09-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2021-09-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2021-09-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-13 | House | Representative Plumer added as a coauthor |
2021-09-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Magnafici |
2021-09-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Magnafici |
2021-08-25 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2021-06-22 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2021-06-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced |