WI AB375 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Representative Vining added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Representative Vining added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 27.01 (9) (bn) (title); and to create 27.01 (9) (bg) of the statutes; Relating to: fee waivers for state park vehicle admission receipts to pupils with Every Kid Outdoors passes. (FE)
Title
Fee waivers for state park vehicle admission receipts to pupils with Every Kid Outdoors passes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 12, Noes 2 |
2022-02-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2021-10-06 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2021-09-13 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2021-08-04 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2021-07-08 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2021-07-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced |