WI AB361 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 40.03 (6) (L) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing local government employees to participate in ancillary insurance coverage programs offered by the Group Insurance Board to state employees. (FE)
Title
Authorizing local government employees to participate in ancillary insurance coverage programs offered by the Group Insurance Board to state employees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-07 | House | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-10-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-15 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2015-10-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-12 | House | Representative Thiesfeldt withdrawn as a coauthor |
2015-10-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2015-09-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab361 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB361.pdf |