WI AB360 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 97.29 (2) (b) 2. (intro.), 97.29 (2) (b) 2. c., 97.29 (2) (b) 2. e., 97.29 (6) (title), 97.29 (6) (a) and 97.29 (6) (b); to repeal and recreate 97.29 (2) (b) 2. b.; and to create 97.29 (1) (he), 97.29 (1) (j), 97.29 (2) (b) 3., 97.29 (2) (be), 97.30 (1) (be), 97.30 (2) (b) 3., 97.30 (2) (b) 4., 97.30 (2) (be) and 97.30 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: the sale of homemade baked goods and homemade canned goods.
Title
The sale of homemade baked goods and homemade canned goods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-21 | House | Representative Ohnstad withdrawn as a coauthor |
2018-02-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ott |
2017-06-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Small Business Development |
2017-06-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab360 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB360.pdf |