WI AB350 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on November 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-07 - Published 11-8-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on November 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-07 - Published 11-8-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 551.102 (11) (o), 551.202 (13) (am) (intro.), 551.202 (14) (a) (intro.), 551.202 (24), 551.401 (1), 551.402 (2) (b), 551.402 (2) (f) and 552.01 (6) (c); and to create 227.01 (13) (zz), 551.102 (1g), 551.201 (3) (d), 551.202 (26), 551.202 (27), 551.205, 551.206, 551.607 (2) (g) and 551.614 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: exemptions from securities registration requirements. (FE)
Title
Exemptions from securities registration requirements. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-07 | House | Published 11-8-2013 |
2013-11-07 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-7-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 52 |
2013-11-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-5-2013 |
2013-10-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2013 |
2013-10-18 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2013-10-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-10-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Local Government |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-10-08 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-08 | House | Representatives Barca and Jorgensen added as coauthors |
2013-10-08 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-10-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-08 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-08 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-10-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-10-08 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-08 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2013-10-03 | House | Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2013-10-01 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2013-10-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2013-10-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-09-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Craig and Weininger |
2013-09-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-26 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2013-09-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Craig and Weininger |
2013-08-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-08-29 | House | Introduced |