WI AB347 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.13 and 38.21 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting University of Wisconsin System institutions and technical colleges from requiring testing for, or vaccination against, the 2019 novel coronavirus.
Title
Prohibiting University of Wisconsin System institutions and technical colleges from requiring testing for, or vaccination against, the 2019 novel coronavirus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2021-06-24 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-02 | House | Representatives Thiesfeldt and Armstrong added as coauthors |
2021-06-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics |
2021-05-26 | House | Introduced |