WI AB34 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.455 (2) (hd) and 48.48 (19); and to create 20.437 (1) (hf), 814.75 (28), 814.76 (21), 944.35 and 973.05 (2m) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2019-05-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2019-03-28 | House | Representative Duchow added as a coauthor |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-03-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Emerson, Crowley, Spreitzer, Cabrera and Stubbs |
2019-03-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brandtjen |
2019-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab34 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB34.pdf |