WI AB34 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 20.455 (2) (hd) and 48.48 (19); and to create 20.437 (1) (hf), 814.75 (28), 814.76 (21), 944.35 and 973.05 (2m) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-05-08HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2019-05-08HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2019-03-28HouseRepresentative Duchow added as a coauthor
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken
2019-03-27HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-27HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Emerson, Crowley, Spreitzer, Cabrera and Stubbs
2019-03-26HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-22HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brandtjen
2019-03-20HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-07HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-07HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-02-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback