WI AB339 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 62.23 (7) (em) 1.; and to create 62.23 (7) (em) 2e. of the statutes; Relating to: limiting certain 2nd class cities' ability to designate or regulate historic landmarks. (FE)
Title
Limiting certain 2nd class cities' ability to designate or regulate historic landmarks. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Allen |
2019-07-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2019-07-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab339 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB339.pdf |