WI AB335 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Published 3-18-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Published 3-18-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.455 (2) (d) and 165.98 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to law enforcement agencies for body cameras. (FE)
Title
Grants to law enforcement agencies for body cameras. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Published 3-18-2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-17-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 185 |
2022-03-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38 |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Bowen, McGuire, Emerson, Ohnstad, Cabrera, Conley, Drake, Shelton, Pope, Anderson, Riemer, Baldeh, Sinicki, L. Myers and Hebl |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steineke |
2021-06-11 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-06-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-06-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-03 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2021-06-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Steineke and Stubbs |
2021-05-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-25 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-05-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced |