WI AB334 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0511 (1); to amend 66.0511 (title); and to create 66.0511 (1) (b) and 66.0511 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: drug testing of law enforcement officers involved in certain critical incidents while on duty. (FE)
Title
Drug testing of law enforcement officers involved in certain critical incidents while on duty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38 |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Bowen, Emerson, Ohnstad, Cabrera, Conley, Considine, Drake, Shelton, Pope, Anderson, Riemer, Baldeh, Sinicki, L. Myers and Hebl |
2021-06-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-15 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2021-06-11 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-06-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-06-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-03 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2021-06-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Steineke and Stubbs |
2021-05-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced |