WI AB315 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 448.95 (5m); and to amend 448.955 (3) (c), 448.956 (1) (a) and 448.956 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: the practice of athletic training.
Title
The practice of athletic training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-22 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-05-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2021-05-07 | House | Introduced |