WI AB31 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 49.45 (2p), 49.45 (23), 108.04 (2) (h) and 108.04 (12) (f); to renumber and amend 450.11 (5) (br) 3.; to amend 20.435 (4) (jw), 40.22 (1), 40.22 (2m) (intro.), 40.22 (2r) (intro.), 40.22 (3) (intro.), 40.26 (1m) (a), 40.26 (1m) (b), 40.26 (5m), 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 49.45 (23b) (title), 49.45 (23b) (b), 49.45 (23b) (c), 49.45 (23b) (e), 49.471 (4) (a) 4. b., 49.686 (3) (d), 66.0137 (4), 102.565 (6), 103.025 (title), 103.10 (1) (c), 103.10 (2) (c), 103.10 (5) (a), 103.10 (8), 103.10 (9) (a) and (b), 103.10 (9) (c) 4., 103.10 (9) (d), 103.10 (12) (d), 108.04 (3) (b), 108.062 (2) (d), 108.062 (20) (intro.), 108.062 (20) (c), 108.07 (5) (bm) 3. b., 115.385 (6), 115.415 (1) (b), 120.13 (2) (g), 140.145 (10) (a), 140.145 (10) (b), 185.983 (1) (intro.), 323.19 (4) (b), 323.2912, 323.2913, 440.15, 450.01 (11m), 450.01 (21s), 450.02 (1), 450.11 (5) (br) 2. d., 609.205 (2) and (3) (intro.) and (a) and 632.895 (16v) (a) (intro.); to repeal and recreate 115.437 (2) (b) and 632.895 (14g) (b); and to create 16.34, 20.115 (3) (b), 20.435 (1) (dw), 20.435 (4) (bu), 20.505 (1) (bk), 20.505 (1) (ft), 20.835 (2) (an), 40.26 (7), 49.471 (1) (cr), 49.471 (4) (a) 8., 49.471 (4g), 49.681, 73.03 (75), 93.485, 102.03 (7), 103.025 (1) (bm), 103.025 (3), 103.10 (1) (dm), 103.10 (4m), 252.02 (8), 323.19 (3m), 323.19 (3p), 323.267, 440.08 (2) (a) 69g., 450.01 (13w), 450.01 (23) (p), 450.075, 450.11 (5) (br) 3. b., 609.719, 609.887, 632.871, 632.895 (14f) and 655.0025 of the statutes; Relating to: state government response to COVID-19 pandemic, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
State government response to COVID-19 pandemic, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced |