WI AB302 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 77.54 (70) and 238.40 of the statutes; Relating to: a sales and use tax exemption for data center equipment or software. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A sales and use tax exemption for data center equipment or software. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-02-12SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Quinn
2024-01-17SenatePublic hearing held
2024-01-16SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn
2023-06-23SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
2023-06-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2023-06-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2023-06-21HouseRead a third time and passed
2023-06-21HouseRules suspended
2023-06-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2023-06-21HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2023-06-21HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
2023-06-21HouseRead a second time
2023-06-21HouseRepresentative Macco added as a coauthor
2023-06-20HouseReport of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2023-06-20HouseExecutive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
2023-06-15HousePlaced on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
2023-06-15HouseReport of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
2023-06-15HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2023-06-15HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
2023-06-15HouseExecutive action taken
2023-06-08HouseRepresentative Dittrich added as a coauthor
2023-06-08HousePublic hearing held
2023-06-05HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-06-05HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-06-01HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2023-06-01HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab302
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/AB302.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/AB302-ASA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/AB302-SA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/AB302-SA2.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/fe/ab302/ab302_dor.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/fe/ab302/ab302_wedc.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/assembly/ways_and_means/1731988.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/fe/ab302/ab302_jscte.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2023/REG/AB302.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/joint/tax_exemptions/1791166.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback