WI AB300 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 66.0137 (1) (ae); to amend 20.155 (3) (t), 20.835 (1) (db), 20.835 (1) (r), 59.23 (2) (s), 66.0137 (3), 66.0137 (4m) (a), 66.0137 (5) (c) 1. and 66.0137 (5) (c) 2.; to repeal and recreate 66.0137 (5) (c) 3.; and to create 20.155 (3) (u), 66.0137 (1) (af), 66.0137 (1) (am), 66.0137 (1) (ap), 66.0137 (1) (c), 66.0137 (5) (c) 1m., 66.0137 (5) (c) 4. and 66.0137 (5) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring political subdivisions and Marquette University to pay health insurance premiums for survivors of a law enforcement officer who dies in the line of duty and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring political subdivisions and Marquette University to pay health insurance premiums for survivors of a law enforcement officer who dies in the line of duty and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors

Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. Steve Doyle [D]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]Rep. Jill Billings [D]
Rep. David Bowen [D]Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R]Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R]
Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]Rep. Evan Goyke [D]
Rep. Gary Hebl [D]Rep. Dianne Hesselbein [D]Rep. Gordon Hintz [D]Rep. Cody Horlacher [R]
Rep. Jesse James [R]Rep. Joel Kitchens [R]Rep. Debra Kolste [D]Rep. Scott Krug [R]
Rep. Robert Kulp [R]Rep. Tony Kurtz [R]Rep. John Macco [R]Rep. Nick Milroy [D]
Rep. David Murphy [R]Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]Rep. Greta Neubauer [D]
Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. John Nygren [R]Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Jim Ott [R]
Rep. Warren Petryk [R]Rep. Sondy Pope [D]Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]Rep. Romaine Quinn [R]
Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R]Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]Rep. Michael Schraa [R]Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]
Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]
Rep. Rob Stafsholt [R]Rep. David Steffen [R]Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Amanda Stuck [D]
Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]Rep. Rob Summerfield [R]Rep. Rob Swearingen [R]Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]
Rep. Chris Taylor [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]Rep. Paul Tittl [R]Rep. Travis Tranel [R]
Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R]
Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R]Rep. Ed Brooks [R]Rep. John Jagler [R]
Rep. Robert Wittke [R]Rep. Mark Born [R]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Janet Bewley [D]
Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]
Sen. Scott Fitzgerald [R]Sen. David Hansen [D]Sen. Andre Jacque [R]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]
Sen. Howard Marklein [R]Sen. Luther Olsen [R]Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]
Sen. Fred Risser [D]Sen. Roger Roth [R]Sen. Patty Schachtner [D]Sen. Jeff Smith [D]
Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Patrick Testin [R]Sen. Robert Wirch [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros
2019-07-11HouseRepresentative McGuire added as a coauthor
2019-07-09HouseSenator Kooyenga added as a cosponsor
2019-07-09HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-07-03HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-20HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-06-20HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback