WI AB299 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 252.045 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting proof of vaccination for COVID-19 as a condition of receiving business and government services.
Title
Prohibiting proof of vaccination for COVID-19 as a condition of receiving business and government services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-13-2022 |
2022-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report concurrence without recommendation, pursuant to Senate Rule 27 (4)(a), by Committee on Health, Ayes 2, Noes 2 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 37 |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-11 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-09 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2021-06-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-08 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2021-06-02 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-06-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-24 | House | Representative Behnke added as a coauthor |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics |
2021-05-03 | House | Introduced |