WI AB299 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.35 (1); and to create 36.02 and 227.01 (13) (Lo) of the statutes; Relating to: free expression within the University of Wisconsin System, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Free expression within the University of Wisconsin System, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Printed engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk-4261 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 36 |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kremer |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-14 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:04 PM on 6-21-2017 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 11 |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-02 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2017-06-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2017-05-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer |
2017-05-23 | House | LRB correction |
2017-05-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2017-05-05 | House | Introduced |