WI AB299 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 120.20 of the statutes; Relating to: allowing a school board member to serve as a volunteer coach or extracurricular activity supervisor.
Title
Allowing a school board member to serve as a volunteer coach or extracurricular activity supervisor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2015-09-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-09-03 | House | Representative Horlacher added as a coauthor |
2015-08-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-08-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab299 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB299.pdf |