WI AB297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 287.17 (8) (b) 3.; to renumber and amend 287.17 (1) (k), 287.17 (8) (b) 1. and 287.17 (8) (b) 2.; to amend 287.17 (1) (eg) 1. b., 287.17 (1) (eg) 2., 287.17 (1) (np), 287.17 (3) (a) (intro.), 287.17 (3) (e), 287.17 (4) (b) 1., 287.17 (4) (b) 2., 287.17 (4) (b) 3., 287.17 (4) (d) (intro.), 287.17 (5) (a) 1. a., 287.17 (5) (a) 1. b., 287.17 (5) (a) 1. c., 287.17 (5) (b), 287.17 (7) (a) 1. (intro.), 287.17 (7) (a) 2., 287.17 (7) (b), 287.17 (8) (a) 1. (intro.), 287.17 (8) (a) 2., 287.17 (8) (c) 4., 287.17 (9m), 287.17 (10) (d) (intro.), 287.17 (10) (j) and 287.17 (10) (k); and to create 287.17 (1) (k) 1., 287.17 (1) (k) 2., 287.17 (1) (k) 3., 287.17 (1) (pg), 287.17 (4) (b) (intro.), 287.17 (4) (be), 287.17 (8) (b) 1m., 2m., 3m., 4. and 5. and 287.17 (10) (m) of the statutes; Relating to: changes to the electronic waste recycling program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes to the electronic waste recycling program and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-09-12HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2019-09-12HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2019-09-03HouseExecutive action taken
2019-08-29HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau
2019-08-26HouseRepresentative Gruszynski added as a coauthor
2019-08-15HousePublic hearing held
2019-08-15HouseRepresentative Kitchens added as a coauthor
2019-06-26HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-13HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Environment
2019-06-13HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback