WI AB296 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g) and 185.983 (1) (intro.); and to create 632.851 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring direct reimbursement of emergency medical services under health insurance policies and plans.
Title
Requiring direct reimbursement of emergency medical services under health insurance policies and plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-08-09 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-07-19 | House | Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2023-05-25 | House | Introduced |