WI AB296 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 250.15 (1); and to create 250.15 (1) (b), 250.15 (2) (d), 440.01 (1) (ab), (bm), (dg) and (hm) and 440.17 of the statutes; Relating to: funding for free and charitable clinics and defining telehealth. (FE)
Title
Funding for free and charitable clinics and defining telehealth. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-24 | House | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2022-01-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-10-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-07-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-22 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2021-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-04 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-05-03 | House | Introduced |