WI AB296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 100.171 (3) (f) 1.; to amend 100.171 (3) (b) 1., 100.171 (3) (b) 2. and 100.171 (3) (d); and to create 100.171 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: notices of eligibility to receive a prize.
Title
Notices of eligibility to receive a prize.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-11-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab296 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB296.pdf |