WI AB294 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 157.02 (1); to amend 157.02 (2), 157.02 (5), 301.325, 302.14, 973.20 (11) (c) and 979.10 (1) (a) (intro.); and to create 157.02 (1) (a) and 157.02 (1) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: burial or cremation and burial of a deceased prison inmate, cremation of an unclaimed corpse, and prohibition on cremation of an unclaimed corpse in cases of homicide. (FE)
Title
Burial or cremation and burial of a deceased prison inmate, cremation of an unclaimed corpse, and prohibition on cremation of an unclaimed corpse in cases of homicide. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-11-14 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-11-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-10-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton |
2017-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab294 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB294.pdf |